IN HB1344 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 171
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 171
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Unemployment insurance. Abolishes the Indiana unemployment compensation board and transfers the board's duties to the department of workforce development (department). Revises the circumstances under which the department may waive work search requirements for an individual receiving benefits. Provides that, after an individual begins receiving benefits, the individual must visit and receive an orientation to the services available through a one stop center in order to maintain eligibility to receive benefits. Allows the department to waive the orientation requirement under certain circumstances. Requires the department to submit a report to the general assembly and the governor before December 1 of each
Title
Unemployment insurance. Abolishes the Indiana unemployment compensation board and transfers the board's duties to the department of workforce development (department). Revises the circumstances under which the department may waive work search requirements for an individual receiving benefits. Provides that, after an individual begins receiving benefits, the individual must visit and receive an orientation to the services available through a one stop center in order to maintain eligibility to receive benefits. Allows the department to waive the orientation requirement under certain circumstances. Requires the department to submit a report to the general assembly and the governor before December 1 of each
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 67 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 67 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Public Law 171 |
2016-03-23 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 376: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-03-09 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 406: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2016-03-08 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2016-03-08 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Kenley and Arnold J |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Boots and Tallian |
2016-03-03 | House | House advisors appointed: Wesco, Ober and Bartlett |
2016-03-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Leonard and Moseley |
2016-03-02 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2016-03-02 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 297: yeas 39, nays 11 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Boots) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions & Labor |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-01-25 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Boots and Kenley |
2016-01-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 35: yeas 67, nays 27 |
2016-01-21 | House | Representative Wesco added as coauthor |
2016-01-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-19 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2016-01-12 | House | Authored by Representative Leonard |