IN HB1343 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-24 - Reassigned to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-24 - Reassigned to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School City of East Chicago fiscal matters. Changes, for the school years beginning after June 30, 2016, June 30, 2017, and June 30, 2018, the manner in which average daily membership is determined for the School City of East Chicago school corporation. Transfers, not later than July 15, 2017, to the school disaster loan fund from the state general fund an amount equal to the total amount to pay off the loan that was made to the School City of East Chicago school corporation in the amount of $2,805,000 from the school disaster loan fund. Appropriates to the department of
Title
School City of East Chicago fiscal matters. Changes, for the school years beginning after June 30, 2016, June 30, 2017, and June 30, 2018, the manner in which average daily membership is determined for the School City of East Chicago school corporation. Transfers, not later than July 15, 2017, to the school disaster loan fund from the state general fund an amount equal to the total amount to pay off the loan that was made to the School City of East Chicago school corporation in the amount of $2,805,000 from the school disaster loan fund. Appropriates to the department of
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-24 | House | Reassigned to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-01-23 | House | Representative Olthoff added as coauthor |
2017-01-12 | House | Representative Smith, V. added as coauthor |
2017-01-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-12 | House | Authored by Representative Harris |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1343/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/2/d/292d37a3/HB1343.01.INTR.pdf |