IN HB1341 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 424: yeas 37, nays 10
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 424: yeas 37, nays 10
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Autonomous vehicles. Provides that a political subdivision may not enact a measure, ordinance, policy, regulation, rule, or other restriction that prohibits the authorized use of: (1) an automated driving system; (2) an automated vehicle; or (3) an on demand automated vehicle network. Provides that a person in possession of a valid driver's license may operate an automated vehicle at a Level 1, 2 or 3 on a public highway. Requires any person or entity who operates an automated vehicle to maintain proof of financial responsibility with the bureau of motor vehicles (bureau). Requires automated vehicles to comply with all applicable
Title
Autonomous vehicles. Provides that a political subdivision may not enact a measure, ordinance, policy, regulation, rule, or other restriction that prohibits the authorized use of: (1) an automated driving system; (2) an automated vehicle; or (3) an on demand automated vehicle network. Provides that a person in possession of a valid driver's license may operate an automated vehicle at a Level 1, 2 or 3 on a public highway. Requires any person or entity who operates an automated vehicle to maintain proof of financial responsibility with the bureau of motor vehicles (bureau). Requires automated vehicles to comply with all applicable
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 424: yeas 37, nays 10 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Raatz, Melton, Doriot and Ruckelshaus |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Crider and Niezgodski |
2018-03-07 | House | House advisors appointed: Sullivan, Ober, Lindauer, Forestal and DeLaney |
2018-03-07 | House | House conferees appointed: Soliday and Hatfield |
2018-03-07 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2018-03-07 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 328: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Crider) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as second sponsor |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senator Melton added as cosponsor |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2018-01-29 | House | Representatives Lindauer, Frye, Forestal added as coauthors |
2018-01-29 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-25 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Crider |
2018-01-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 51: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2018-01-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-18 | House | Representative Hatfield added as coauthor |
2018-01-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2018-01-11 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Sullivan and Ober |
2018-01-11 | House | Authored by Representative Soliday |