IN HB1337 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Notification of water utilities and water treatment plants. Provides that the environmental rules board shall amend provisions within the administrative rules governing spills to provide for notification to a water utility and water treatment plant in the event of a spill or release of any substance to a water that may cause a threat to the operation of a water utility or water treatment plant.
Title
Notification of water utilities and water treatment plants.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Hatfield [D] | Rep. Carey Hamilton [D] | Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Heath VanNatter [R] |
Sen. John Ruckelshaus [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-28 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Ruckelshaus |
2020-01-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 108: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-21 | House | Representatives Hamilton, Miller, VanNatter added as coauthors |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Hatfield |