IN HB1325 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
Pending: Senate Health and Provider Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Transmission of communicable diseases. Changes the following defined terms: (1) "carrier" to "individual with a communicable disease"; (2) "dangerous communicable disease" to "serious communicable disease"; and (3) "dangerous disease" to "serious disease". Specifies that an individual must intentionally meet all the delineated conditions to commit the offense of transmitting a communicable disease. Requires that for violations of the communicable disease laws: (1) an information or indictment alleging the violations be redacted in accordance with rules adopted by the Indiana supreme court; (2) the court close the proceedings; and; (3) the medical information of the parties is confidential. Removes the authority of a court to limit testing to a test only for human immunodeficiency virus (HIV) if the defendant is charged with battery or domestic battery involving placing bodily fluid or waste on another person. Removes certain references to AIDS. Repeals the crimes of: (1) recklessly, knowingly, or intentionally donating, selling, or transferring blood or semen for artificial insemination that contains HIV; and (2) infecting an individual through the act of donating, selling, or transferring blood or semen. Makes conforming changes. Makes a technical correction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transmission of communicable diseases. Changes the following defined terms: (1) "carrier" to "individual with a communicable disease"; (2) "dangerous communicable disease" to "serious communicable disease"; and (3) "dangerous disease" to "serious disease". Specifies that an individual must intentionally meet all the delineated conditions to commit the offense of transmitting a communicable disease. Requires that for violations of the communicable disease laws: (1) an information or indictment alleging the violations be redacted in accordance with rules adopted by the Indiana supreme court; (2) the court close the proceedings; and; (3) the medical information of the parties is confidential. Removes the authority of a court to limit testing to a test only for human immunodeficiency virus (HIV) if the defendant is charged with battery or domestic battery involving placing bodily fluid or waste on another person. Removes certain references to AIDS. Repeals the crimes of: (1) recklessly, knowingly, or intentionally donating, selling, or transferring blood or semen for artificial insemination that contains HIV; and (2) infecting an individual through the act of donating, selling, or transferring blood or semen. Makes conforming changes. Makes a technical correction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - Third reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-02-21HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-20HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Becker and Breaux
2019-02-20HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 245: yeas 99, nays 0
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Brown T, Shackleford and Cook
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Clere

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback