IN HB1323 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a postsecondary educational institution to develop a policy for the emergency administration of an auto-injectable epinephrine to a student, faculty member, or staff member under certain circumstances. Sets forth requirements for the policy and for those employees who act as trained designees and administer the epinephrine. Requires the state department of health to set forth guidelines for the policies. Allows a health care provider to write a prescription for epinephrine for a postsecondary educational institution and allows a pharmacist to dispense the prescription. Requires storage of the epinephrine in a safe location. Provides for civil immunity for licensed campus medical professionals, trained designees, and certain healthcare providers in the administration of epinephrine in compliance with the policy and guidelines.
Title
Epinephrine in institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Rep. David Ober [R] | Rep. Steven Davisson [R] | Rep. Jim Lucas [R] | Rep. Vernon Smith [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 132302 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 132301 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 132302 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 132301 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-24 | House | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | House | Public Law 45 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 401: yeas 45 and nays 0 |
2014-03-11 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 446: yeas 83 and nays 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Pat Miller added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Ober added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative V. Smith added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Davisson added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Clere added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Errington added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 229: yeas 47 and nays 0 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services |
2014-01-30 | House | Senator Miller Patricia added as sponsor. |
2014-01-30 | House | Senator Grooms added as second sponsor. |
2014-01-30 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-30 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 157: yeas 90 and nays 0 |
2014-01-29 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-29 | House | Representative Lucas added as coauthor. |
2014-01-29 | House | Representative V. Smith added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Davisson added as coauthor. |
2014-01-27 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-15 | House | First Reading: Referred to Education |
2014-01-15 | House | Authored by Representative Ober. |