IN HB1320 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Purchases from youth agricultural programs. Raises the total amount of food that a public school or school corporation (purchasing agency) may purchase from a youth agricultural education program to $10,000 per fiscal year. Specifies that if a purchasing agency purchases more than $10,000 of food from a youth agricultural educational program per fiscal year, the purchasing agency must comply with the applicable federal procurement requirements.
Title
Purchases from youth agricultural programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Snow [R] | Rep. Doug Gutwein [R] | Rep. Maureen Bauer [D] | Rep. Justin Moed [D] |
Sen. Brian Buchanan [R] | Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Kevin Boehnlein [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Public Law 82 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 244: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senators Boehnlein and Kruse added as cosponsors |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-31 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Buchanan and Leising |
2022-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 150: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2022-01-27 | House | Representative Moed added as coauthor |
2022-01-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-25 | House | Representatives Gutwein and Bauer M added as coauthors |
2022-01-24 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-18 | House | Reassigned to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development |
2022-01-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-11 | House | Authored by Representative Snow |