IN HB1318 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Construction/demolition site in Gary. Provides that the prohibition against establishing a sanitary landfill within one-half mile of an area subdivided for residential purposes does not apply to the establishment of a construction/demolition site located within the corporate limits of a city that has a population of more than 80,000 and less than 80,400 and whose fiscal body and executive have filed a petition with the distressed unit appeal board seeking to have the city designated as a distressed political subdivision.
Title
Construction/demolition site in Gary. Provides that the prohibition against establishing a sanitary landfill within one-half mile of an area subdivided for residential purposes does not apply to the establishment of a construction/demolition site located within the corporate limits of a city that has a population of more than 80,000 and less than 80,400 and whose fiscal body and executive have filed a petition with the distressed unit appeal board seeking to have the city designated as a distressed political subdivision.
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Harris [D] | Rep. Vernon Smith [D] | Rep. Charlie Brown [D] | Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] |
Rep. Harold Slager [R] | Sen. Eddie Melton [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-31 | House | Representative Slager added as coauthor |
2018-01-31 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2018-01-31 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Melton |
2018-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 108: yeas 89, nays 3 |
2018-01-30 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-25 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-23 | House | Representative Soliday added as coauthor |
2018-01-18 | House | Representatives Smith, V. and Brown, C. added as coauthors |
2018-01-16 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2018-01-16 | House | Authored by Representative Harris |