IN HB1318 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Public Law 148
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Public Law 148
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance matters. Provides that, for purposes of the insurance law, a United States Postal Service intelligent mail bar code tracking record, a certificate of mailing, or another similar first class mail method may be used as proof of mailing. Provides that an insurance producer education course may concern sales, motivation, psychology, and time management. Limits continuing education in those areas to four hours per renewal period. Allows a prospective continuing education provider to electronically submit supporting materials for a course. Amends the description of an extraordinary dividend or distribution for purposes of the insurance holding company system law. Removes requirements
Title
Insurance matters. Provides that, for purposes of the insurance law, a United States Postal Service intelligent mail bar code tracking record, a certificate of mailing, or another similar first class mail method may be used as proof of mailing. Provides that an insurance producer education course may concern sales, motivation, psychology, and time management. Limits continuing education in those areas to four hours per renewal period. Allows a prospective continuing education provider to electronically submit supporting materials for a course. Amends the description of an extraordinary dividend or distribution for purposes of the insurance holding company system law. Removes requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D] | Rep. Richard Hamm [R] |
Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Frank Mrvan [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Public Law 148 |
2017-04-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 435: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senator Walker added as second sponsor |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 340: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as cosponsor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-20 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-09 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Holdman |
2017-02-09 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 93: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2017-02-07 | House | Amendment #1 (Torr) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-07 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-02 | House | Representative Hamm added as coauthor |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance |
2017-01-10 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Lehman and Austin |
2017-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Carbaugh |