IN HB1314 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Public Law 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recorded discriminatory covenants. Permits a person to file a statement or notice that a recorded discriminatory covenant is invalid and unenforceable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recorded discriminatory covenants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01HousePublic Law 20
2021-04-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-03-31SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-11SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2021-03-11SenateSenator Qaddoura added as cosponsor
2021-03-09SenateSenator Buck added as cosponsor
2021-03-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 215: yeas 46, nays 0
2021-03-08SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-04SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-18SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-02-02HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-01HouseRepresentative Karickhoff added as coauthor
2021-02-01HouseRepresentative Porter added as coauthor
2021-02-01HouseCosponsor: Senator Randolph
2021-02-01HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Baldwin, Brown L, Taylor G
2021-02-01HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 28: yeas 95, nays 0
2021-01-28HouseRepresentative Cook added as coauthor
2021-01-28HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-26HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Torr

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1314/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/3/4/a334cc09/HB1314.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/d/0/d1d01644/HB1314.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/b/e/fdbe405b/HB1314.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/d/d/fadd01f3/HB1314.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/b/0/dab02c83/HB1314.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/9/0/eb903e34/HB1314.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/6/8/8e6884b6/HB1314.04.ENRS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/1/d/6a1d678d/HB1314.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/c/6/7fc6ce05/HB1314.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/9/d/f99d797e/HB1314.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/7/9/0279b242/HB1314.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/8/c/918c2314/HB1314.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/a/c/2cacbb6d/HB1314.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/3/6/f136e385/HB1314.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/6/2/2462f5fc/HB1314.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/2/4/9824cb7d/HB1314.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/0/9/7a09e107/HB1314.04.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/c/0/c3c043e9/HB1314.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/4/d/074d9955/HB1314.28_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/a/0/a1a042f4/HB1314.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/5/2/4d520cae/HB1314.215_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback