IN HB1305 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Gas and oil well assessment. Provides for the imposition of a monetary penalty against owners of oil or gas interests who fail to timely file a property schedule for gas and oil well assessments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gas and oil well assessment. Provides for the imposition of a monetary penalty against owners of oil or gas interests who fail to timely file a property schedule for gas and oil well assessments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HousePublic Law 83
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-15SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-11HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 464: yeas 92, nays 1
2019-04-08HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-03-26SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-03-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 307: yeas 46, nays 0
2019-03-21SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-19SenateSenator Doriot added as second sponsor
2019-03-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-05HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Messmer
2019-02-05HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 109: yeas 94, nays 0
2019-02-04HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-31HouseRepresentatives Bacon and Hatfield added as coauthors
2019-01-31HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-29HouseRepresentative Hostettler added as coauthor
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Lindauer

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1305/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/b/c/f2bc9f19/HB1305.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/3/6/0d3627e4/HB1305.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/b/d/9bbd83bd/HB1305.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/1/9/12192c12/HB1305.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/3/f/803ff1aa/HB1305.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/1/e/6f1ea76a/HB1305.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/4/9/3e4971ed/HB1305.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/2/5/2925f33b/HB1305.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/a/7/89a76ebf/HB1305.109.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/e/0/a2e01670/HB1305.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/f/3/6ff3d4d4/HB1305.307.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/6/3/6b637067/HB1305.464.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback