IN HB1303 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Public Law 122
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Public Law 122
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tax credit for ABLE account contributions. Creates (beginning January 1, 2024) a stand-alone credit for contributions to Indiana ABLE accounts. Provides that a taxpayer is entitled to a credit against adjusted gross income tax equal to the least of: (1) 20% of the amount of the total contributions made by the taxpayer to an account or accounts of an Indiana ABLE 529A savings plan during the taxable year; (2) $500; or (3) the amount of the taxpayer's adjusted gross income tax for the taxable year, reduced by the sum of all allowable credits. Provides that a taxpayer is not entitled to a carryback, carryover, or refund of an unused credit. Provides that a taxpayer may not sell, assign, convey, or otherwise transfer the tax credit. Provides that an account owner of an Indiana ABLE 529A savings plan must repay all or a part of the credit in a taxable year in which any nonqualified withdrawal is made.
Title
Tax credit for ABLE account contributions.
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Olthoff [R] | Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R] | Rep. J. Michael Davisson [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] |
Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Floor - (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Floor - (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Public Law 122 |
2022-03-14 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-07 | House | House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 345: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2022-03-07 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Niemeyer and Lanane |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Holdman and Randolph Lonnie M |
2022-03-02 | House | House advisors appointed: Karickhoff, Engleman and Klinker |
2022-03-02 | House | House conferees appointed: Olthoff and Pryor |
2022-03-02 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2022-03-02 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 307: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senator Becker added as cosponsor |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2022-02-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-31 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Holdman and Niemeyer |
2022-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 147: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2022-01-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-24 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-20 | House | Representative Clere added as coauthor |
2022-01-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-01-11 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Karickhoff and Davisson J. |
2022-01-11 | House | Authored by Representative Olthoff |