IN HB1302 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Public Law 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Public Law 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency medical services. Provides that not later than July 15, 2024, the county executive shall provide the department of homeland security (department) certain information relating to each emergency medical services (EMS) provider in the county. Provides that not later than August 15, 2024, the department, in consultation with the Indiana emergency medical services commission, shall prepare and submit a report to the general assembly relating to the provision of EMS. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate study committee the topic of improving the provision of EMS throughout Indiana.
Title
Emergency medical services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | House | Public Law 67 |
2024-03-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senators Koch, Leising, Raatz added as cosponsors |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 196: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-02-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-02-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 125: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2024-02-01 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Crider, Dernulc, Alexander |
2024-01-31 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-01-29 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2024-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative O'Brien |
2024-01-10 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Teshka, Manning, Garcia Wilburn |