IN HB1301 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-25 - Public Law 208
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-25 - Public Law 208
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance matters. Updates names of health care provider billing forms. Amends the financial responsibility requirement for a contract carrier that transports railroad employees. Permits the department of insurance and governor to apply for a state innovation waiver under the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. Provides for reduced limits and removal of commercial umbrella or excess liability coverage and requires notice of a reduction or removal. Repeals the law providing for a multistate surplus lines insurance compact, which has not gone into effect due to an insufficient number of states enacting the legislation. Amends the law concerning taxation of
Title
Insurance matters. Updates names of health care provider billing forms. Amends the financial responsibility requirement for a contract carrier that transports railroad employees. Permits the department of insurance and governor to apply for a state innovation waiver under the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. Provides for reduced limits and removal of commercial umbrella or excess liability coverage and requires notice of a reduction or removal. Repeals the law providing for a multistate surplus lines insurance compact, which has not gone into effect due to an insufficient number of states enacting the legislation. Amends the law concerning taxation of
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D] | Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. Richard Hamm [R] |
Sen. Clyde Perfect [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-25 | House | Public Law 208 |
2018-03-25 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 409: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2018-03-14 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 399: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Holdman, Melton, Messmer and Zay |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Perfect and Mrvan |
2018-03-07 | House | House advisors appointed: Morris, Lehman and Harris |
2018-03-07 | House | House conferees appointed: Carbaugh and Austin |
2018-03-07 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2018-03-07 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 299: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Tallian) failed; voice vote |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-02-01 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Perfect |
2018-02-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 137: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2018-01-31 | House | Amendment #1 (Candelaria Reardon) motion withdrawn |
2018-01-31 | House | Amendment #5 (Lehman) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-01-31 | House | Amendment #3 (Carbaugh) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-01-31 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-01-25 | House | Representative Hamm added as coauthor |
2018-01-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-18 | House | Representative Lehman added as coauthor |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance |
2018-01-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative Austin |
2018-01-11 | House | Authored by Representative Carbaugh |