IN HB1298 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Public Law 121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Public Law 121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages. Provides that the alcohol and tobacco commission may not require physical separation between a bar area and a dining area in a food hall. Reduces the length of time that an applicant for an artisan distiller's permit must hold another permit prior to the date of the application. Creates a temporary craft manufacturer hospitality permit (hospitality permit) that allows a craft manufacturer to participate in a convention, a trade show, an exposition, or a similar event on the licensed premises of a particular host permittee. Specifies certain requirements and restrictions concerning a hospitality permit. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Smaltz [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Steve Bartels [R] | Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] |
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Public Law 121 |
2022-03-14 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-03 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 337: yeas 86, nays 6 |
2022-03-02 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 305: yeas 40, nays 8 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as second sponsor |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-31 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Alting |
2022-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 146: yeas 88, nays 2 |
2022-01-26 | House | Representative Bartels added as coauthor |
2022-01-26 | House | Amendment #1 (Bartels) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-26 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-13 | House | Representative Clere added as coauthor |
2022-01-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2022-01-11 | House | Authored by Representative Smaltz |