IN HB1294 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 205
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Local government matters. Provides that in the case of the construction, remodeling, redevelopment, rehabilitation, or repair of real property that is: (1) paid for by a private person using public funds; and (2) owned by a private person after completion of the project; the county assessor must reassess the property by carrying out a physical inspection. Provides that in the case of a city park board, the appointee by the school board may be either a member of the school board or a resident of the school corporation. (Under current law, such an appointee must be a member of the

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government matters. Provides that in the case of the construction, remodeling, redevelopment, rehabilitation, or repair of real property that is: (1) paid for by a private person using public funds; and (2) owned by a private person after completion of the project; the county assessor must reassess the property by carrying out a physical inspection. Provides that in the case of a city park board, the appointee by the school board may be either a member of the school board or a resident of the school corporation. (Under current law, such an appointee must be a member of the

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-04 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24HousePublic Law 205
2016-03-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-10SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 376: yeas 89, nays 0
2016-03-03HouseMotion to concur filed
2016-03-02SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2016-03-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 287: yeas 50, nays 0
2016-02-25SenateAmendment #1 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
2016-02-25SenateReread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-02-23SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2016-02-23SenatePlaced back on second reading
2016-02-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-02-18SenateSenator Buck added as second sponsor
2016-02-18SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2016-02-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2016-01-27HouseReferred to the Senate
2016-01-26HouseRepresentative Wesco added as coauthor
2016-01-26HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Head
2016-01-26HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 49: yeas 95, nays 0
2016-01-25HouseRepresentatives Price and Pryor added as coauthors
2016-01-25HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-01-21HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2016-01-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2016-01-12HouseAuthored by Representative Judy

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/house/1294/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/1/a/0/31a0d4a3/HB1294.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/6/2/5262dcdb/HB1294.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/3/b/6c3b3a7d/HB1294.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/7/0/59706f2d/HB1294.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/d/2/bbd29b08/HB1294.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/e/d/1ded8ed8/HB1294.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/5/8/be589602/HB1294.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/a/3/eca3202c/HB1294.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/7/d/ef7df4cb/HB1294.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/a/d/4fad39bb/HB1294.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/9/9/2799f92b/HB1294.49.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/3/1/a331736d/HB1294.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/5/f/795f5b41/HB1294.287.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/e/f/43ef6899/HB1294.376.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback