IN HB1292 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Public Law 98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Public Law 98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Compensation for victims of violent crimes. Changes, for purposes of the law concerning compensation to victims of violent crime, the definition of "claimant" to include certain family members of a victim. Expands the list of expenses eligible for compensation to include crime scene cleanup and replacement windows or door locks. Allows the victim services division of the Indiana criminal justice institute to accept proof that evidence was collected during a forensic exam as a claimant's cooperation with law enforcement. Specifies that a person who contributed to the injury or death of the victim may not receive benefits.
Title
Compensation for victims of violent crimes.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Negele [R] | Rep. Karen Engleman [R] | Rep. Donna Schaibley [R] | Rep. Maureen Bauer [D] |
Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Public Law 98 |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-01 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 317: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2022-02-28 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senator Becker added as cosponsor |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second sponsor |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 255: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-27 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Crider |
2022-01-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 127: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2022-01-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-25 | House | Representative Bauer M added as coauthor |
2022-01-24 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2022-01-10 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Engleman and Schaibley |
2022-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Negele |