IN HB1287 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 189
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 189
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water or wastewater service. Allows a water or wastewater utility to extend service to a developed but underserved area without a deposit from customers if the extension of service will result in a positive contribution to the utility's overall cost of service over a 20 year period. Provides that the extension of service will be considered as resulting in a positive contribution to the utility's overall cost of service over a 20 year period to the extent that rates to be paid by 50% or more of the customers who could be served by the extension of service would enable the utility to fully recover the weighted cost of debt and depreciation expense attributable to the cost of the main extension for the extension of service. Provides that if a water or wastewater utility determines that an extension of service will not result in a positive contribution to the utility's overall cost of service over a 20 year period, the utility may require a deposit or other adequate assurance of performance from the customers to be served by the extension of service. Provides that if a property owner makes an improvement to the property owner's dwelling, the property owner is not required to upgrade or discontinue use of the property's septic tank soil absorption system or to connect to a sewer system if the improvement does not include the addition of a bedroom or bedroom equivalent and the property owner receives a written determination from a qualified inspector that the septic tank soil absorption system is not failing. Provides that if a tract of land is located within the boundaries of a conservancy district established for sewage purposes, no structure located on the tract of land is connected to or served by the conservancy district's sewage service, the tract of land has been annexed by a municipality that will provide sewer service to the tract of land, and other conditions are met, the owner of the tract of land may petition the court that established the conservancy district for the removal of the tract of land from the boundaries of the conservancy district.
Title
Water or wastewater service.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Pressel [R] | Rep. Ethan Manning [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Public Law 189 |
2021-04-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-19 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 458: yeas 78, nays 0 |
2021-04-15 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 422: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Garten) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Ford Jon) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-02-18 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-02 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Ford Jon and Koch |
2021-02-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 52: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2021-02-01 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2021-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative Manning |
2021-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Pressel |