IN HB1283 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Public Law 146
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Public Law 146
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exoneration payments. Provides that a person applying to the Indiana criminal justice institute seeking compensation for wrongful incarceration must prove that he or she is actually innocent by a preponderance of the evidence. Specifies that payments may be suspended while a defendant is incarcerated for a different offense.
Title
Exoneration payments.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Thompson [R] | Rep. Ben Smaltz [R] | Rep. Gregory Porter [D] |
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Ryan Mishler [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Public Law 146 |
2022-03-15 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 352: yeas 36, nays 14 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 366: yeas 94, nays 1 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2022-03-07 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Mishler and Pol |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Young M and Taylor G |
2022-02-18 | House | House advisors appointed: Thompson, Smaltz, Hatcher and Shackleford |
2022-02-18 | House | House conferees appointed: Steuerwald and Porter |
2022-02-17 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2022-02-17 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 205: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Pol) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-25 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Taylor G |
2022-01-25 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Young M, Mishler, Freeman |
2022-01-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 83: yeas 89, nays 0 |
2022-01-24 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-20 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2022-01-10 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Thompson, Smaltz, Porter |
2022-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Steuerwald |