IN HB1283 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the "Grouseland Rifle" as the official rifle of Indiana, and requires the duplication and sale of the rifle to be authorized by the Grouseland Foundation. Make changes to the qualifications of certain members of the library and historical board (board). Repeals laws authorizing the board to apportion the duties of employees to work for various divisions. Requires the board to make policies, instead of rules, for the library department and its divisions. Repeals the council on library automation. Repeals: (1) certain state library employee qualifications. Requires the board to establish policies, instead of rules for: (1) loans; (2) fees for lost or damaged materials; and (3) third party fees for certain copyright material. Restructures and renames the Indiana state library advisory council as the state library advisory council. Repeals the requirement that the historical bureau maintain and sell certain commemorative medallions and other items. Specifies that state format markers installed after 1945 and markers installed by the Indiana Civil War centennial commission are the property of the state. Requires that the historical bureau shall commemorate George Rogers Clark. (Current law requires that the memory of George Rogers Clark must be celebrated.) Adds electronic media to the definition of "record" for purposes of the public records law. Requires the public records commission to coordinate the use of all scanning equipment in state government. Requires the county commission of public records to implement retention schedules for use by local government officials as part of a records management program for local government public records not more than 30 days after adoption by the oversight committee on public records. (Current law requires the county commission of public records to adopt retention schedules at the first meeting of the county commission after the commission receives the retention schedule.) Removes an application of prior statutes provision from Class 1 library law. Provides that four members of a Class 1 library board constitute a quorum. Provides that six members of a county contractual library board constitute a quorum. Makes changes to the list of persons who may use and be issued library cards at a Class 1 library. Allows Class 1 libraries to charge reduced fees to certain nonresident users of the library district. Requires the disposal of personal property at a Class 1 library to comply with certain requirements. Repeals certain merger requirements for libraries located in consolidated cities. Makes certain changes to the procedure to expand Class 1 libraries. Makes changes to the list of persons who may use and be issued library cards at a Class 2 library. Allows Class 2 libraries to charge reduced fees to certain nonresident users of the library district. Repeals laws concerning library service authorities. Changes the duties and procedures for the investigation and resolution of complaints by the library certification board. Makes conforming changes. Makes technical changes.
Title
Libraries and historic matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-07 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 355: yeas 78, nays 2 | |
2012-02-21 | Senator Hume added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-21 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 232: yeas 48 and nays 2 | |
2012-02-20 | Amendment 2 (Gard), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-20 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-09 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-01-31 | Senate sponsors: Senators Gard and Simpson | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 179: yeas 95, nays 0 | |
2012-01-30 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-26 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-01-11 | Coauthored by Representatives Pierce and Saunders | |
2012-01-11 | Authored by Representative Richardson |