IN HB1279 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various changes to criminal law provisions in motor vehicle law. Modifies statutes concerning driver's license suspension and revocation. Modifies the duties of an operator of a motor vehicle if the operator is involved in certain accidents. Modifies the definition of "highway work zone". Repeals sections concerning "street cars". Repeals certain motor vehicle fraud provisions, and creates a new motor vehicle fraud statute. Creates specialized driving privileges. Requires the bureau of motor vehicles to adopt rules to specify reasonable grounds for suspension or revocation of driving privileges, driver's licenses, certificates of registration, or license plates. Provides that a motor vehicle may be stopped to determine compliance with motor vehicle window tinting standards but may not be inspected, searched, or detained solely because of a violation of window tinting standards. Creates the habitual vehicular substance offender designation and sentencing. Requires: (1) the state department of toxicology (department) to develop standards and testing for ignition interlock devices (devices); and (2) all devices used in Indiana after July 1, 2015 to be certified under rules adopted by the department. Requires a vendor or provider of devices to: (1) report to the court or court's designee certain occurrences concerning the use of devices; and (2) provide any reports or data requested by the department.
Title
Various motor vehicle issues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House Floor - (Y: 50 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 127904 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 127903 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Roll Call 127901 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House Floor - (Y: 50 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 127904 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 127903 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Roll Call 127901 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-27 | House | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | House | Public Law 217 |
2014-03-12 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 428: yeas 80 and nays 10 |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments: failed; Roll Call 420: yeas 50 and nays 35 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 323: yeas 47 and nays 0 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1279 Amendment #2 (Young, M.), prevailed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Appropriations |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reassigned to Corrections & Criminal Law, pursuant to rule 68(b) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator M. Young added as first sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 197: yeas 93 and nays 1 |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1279 Amendment #2 (McMillin), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1279 Amendment #1 (McMillin), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-27 | House | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted. |
2014-01-14 | House | First Reading: Referred to Roads and Transportation |
2014-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative McMillin. |