IN HB1276 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Signed by the President Pro Tempore
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Signed by the President Pro Tempore
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the state board of education to adopt rules and develop policies and administrative procedures concerning secondary level career and technical education programs for cosmetology, electrology, esthetics, barbering, and manicuring courses and classes. Allows the Indiana professional licensing agency to authorize beauty culture schools to offer postsecondary educational programs, courses, or classes in the areas of cosmetology, electrology, esthetics, barbering, and manicuring. Provides that a license issued or renewed by the state board of cosmetology and barber examiners for a barber, barber shop, or barber school must state in prominent type on the license that it is a "barber license", "barber shop license", or "barber school license".
Title
Barber licensing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce, Economic Development & Technology - Roll Call 127602 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions - Roll Call 127601 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce, Economic Development & Technology - Roll Call 127602 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions - Roll Call 127601 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Public Law 75 |
2014-03-04 | House | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 227: yeas 36 and nays 11 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Commerce, Economic Development & Technology |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Charbonneau added as first sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 196: yeas 94 and nays 0 |
2014-01-30 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-14 | House | First Reading: Referred to Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2014-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Slager. |