IN HB1270 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 187
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Department of homeland security. Amends the administrative orders and procedures act to allow for an initial notice of determination to be served by electronic mail or any other method approved by the Indiana Rules of Trial Procedure. (Under current law, the initial notice of determination may be served only by United States mail or personal service.) Repeals provisions concerning the division of planning and assessment, division of preparedness and training, division of emergency response and recovery, and division of fire and building safety (divisions). Assigns all duties of the divisions to the executive director of the department of homeland security (department) or the department generally. Establishes a fire chief executive training program (executive training program). Provides that after January 1, 2022, a newly appointed fire chief of a political subdivision must successfully complete the executive training program within one year of appointment. Provides that a volunteer fire chief is not required to complete the executive training program. Provides that the department of homeland security may allow any of the following individuals to enroll in the executive training program if there is available space in the course: (1) A chief officer. (2) Management level personnel. (3) A volunteer fire chief. (4) A volunteer chief officer. (5) Volunteer management level personnel. Provides that an applicable high school shall comply with all rules of the fire prevention and building safety commission applicable to the primary use of the building. Provides that schools with one or more employees shall create an emergency operations plan regarding unplanned fire alarm activations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of homeland security.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 80 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HousePublic Law 187
2021-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-23SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-22HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-20SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 462: yeas 49, nays 0
2021-04-20HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 465: yeas 80, nays 6
2021-04-19SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2021-04-19HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2021-04-14SenateSenate advisors appointed: Garten and Mrvan
2021-04-14SenateSenate conferees appointed: Crider and Ford J.D.
2021-04-14HouseHouse advisors appointed: Judy, May and Pack
2021-04-14HouseHouse conferees appointed: Frye R and Gore
2021-04-14HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2021-04-14HouseMotion to dissent filed
2021-04-14SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-04-13SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 421: yeas 49, nays 0
2021-04-12SenateSenator Garten added as second sponsor
2021-04-12SenateAmendment #2 (Garten) prevailed; voice vote
2021-04-12SenateAmendment #1 (Crider) prevailed; voice vote
2021-04-12SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-04-08SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-25SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2021-03-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-01SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2021-02-23HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-22HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Crider
2021-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 222: yeas 90, nays 0
2021-02-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-17HouseRepresentatives Judy, May, Gore M added as coauthors
2021-02-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Frye R

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1270/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/e/7/25e7c7eb/HB1270.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/9/2/f792a2fb/HB1270.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/2/9/fd29e53e/HB1270.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/5/2/f1529226/HB1270.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/6/a/166ad478/HB1270.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/d/e/c1decc30/HB1270.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/c/b/3dcbad2f/HB1270.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/d/1/11d115e9/HB1270.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/a/1/16a18b3c/HB1270.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/e/2/c8e2f6fe/HB1270.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/0/d/260d67bd/HB1270.06.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/e/2/6ae24be3/HB1270.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/6/4/19645cbc/HB1270.04.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/3/3/0f33fd12/HB1270.04.COMS.AMS002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/0/5/6e0521d8/HB1270.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/7/8/3b78de94/HB1270.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/9/c/199cae3f/HB1270.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/c/5/19c552b7/HB1270.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/0/4/9404ac09/HB1270.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/a/d/05ad6c4c/HB1270.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/a/3/48a30140/HB1270.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/4/a/424a4d9a/HB1270.03.COMS.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/1/7/d2175759/HB1270.04.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/e/6/9ce66e2e/HB1270.05.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/d/1/c3d1d6fe/HB1270.05.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/c/d/b4cdd6a4/HB1270.05.ENGS.DIS01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/1/9/95197aa7/HB1270.06.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/c/0/2dc04a99/HB1270.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/6/a/426ab756/HB1270.222_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/1/e/751e678c/HB1270.02.COMH.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/8/2/738214bb/HB1270.03.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/2/5/7e252493/HB1270.421_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/f/8/e5f8a1c6/HB1270.462_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/4/c/da4c971b/HB1270.465_H.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback