IN HB1267 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 123
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Withdrawal of candidates. Provides that a candidate may withdraw from being a candidate not later than noon 81 days before the date of a primary election. (Under current law, a candidate wanting to withdraw must do so not later than noon 85 days before the primary election.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Withdrawal of candidates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 123
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-03SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-02HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-02-25SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2020-02-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 228: yeas 48, nays 0
2020-02-20SenateSenator Crane added as second sponsor
2020-02-20SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-17SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-13SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections
2020-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-28HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Messmer
2020-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 99: yeas 97, nays 0
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-16HouseRepresentatives Wesco, Borders, Moseley added as coauthors
2020-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
2020-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Hostettler

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1267/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/6/5/a365335e/HB1267.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/1/a/0c1a1d7e/HB1267.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/d/9/e2d9dbff/HB1267.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/c/1/acc1f408/HB1267.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/d/9/1cd9ccad/HB1267.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/7/4/7074a922/HB1267.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/5/b/b45b111a/HB1267.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/9/f/b69ff88a/HB1267.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/7/1/f9714c74/HB1267.99_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/a/b/6aab4bdf/HB1267.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/6/9/1c69d08c/HB1267.228_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback