IN HB1266 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that public utility property tax returns shall be filed in the manner prescribed by the department of local government finance (DLGF). Allows a railroad car company to file its return by July 1 (rather than May 1). Authorizes a public utility company to file an amended return. Provides that the penalty assessed on a public utility company for filing a late return may not exceed $1,000. Deletes from current law the authority of the DLGF to extend the due date for a public utility company to file a return with the DLGF. Provides that if the DLGF assesses the property of a public utility company because the public utility company does not file a return, the public utility company may file a return with the DLGF and the DLGF may amend its assessment. Provides that if, after an assessment date, an exempt property is transferred or its use is changed resulting in its ineligibility for an exemption, the county assessor shall terminate the exemption for that assessment date. Specifies that if the property remains eligible for an exemption following the transfer or change in use, the exemption shall be left in place for that assessment date. Provides that for the following assessment date, the person that obtained the exemption or the current owner of the property shall file an application with the county assessor. Requires applications for certain property tax deductions to be completed and dated in the calendar year for which the taxpayer wishes to obtain the deduction and to be filed with the county auditor on or before January 5 of the immediately succeeding calendar year. Provides that a petition to correct an error must be filed within three years after the taxes were first due. Requires a political subdivision to submit to the DLGF information concerning the
Title
Local government finance issues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy - Roll Call 126603 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 28 N: 62 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 126601 (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy - Roll Call 126603 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 28 N: 62 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 126601 (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | House | Public Law 183 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 429: yeas 45 and nays 1 |
2014-03-12 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 467: yeas 97 and nays 0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Broden added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Kersey added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Mayfield added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Thompson added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Pryor added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Leonard added as conferee |
2014-03-05 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 321: yeas 46 and nays 1 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senator Broden added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1266 Amendment #3 (Kenley), prevailed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1266 Amendment #2 (Leising), prevailed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1266 Amendment #1 (Hershman), prevailed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Holdman added second sponsor. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Hershman added as sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 195: yeas 82 and nays 12 |
2014-01-30 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1266 Amendment #6 (Macer), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1266 Amendment #5 (Pryor), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1266 Amendment #4 (Porter) motion withdrawn. |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1266 Amendment #3 (Porter), failed. |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1266 Amendment #1 (Negele), prevailed. |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-14 | House | First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Leonard. |