IN HB1262 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Public Law 97
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Public Law 97
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Outdoor advertising signs. Establishes procedures for the valuation of an outdoor advertising sign (sign) that cannot be elevated or relocated to a conforming location within the market area due to a change along the interstate and primary system or any other highway. Requires the Indiana department of transportation to provide written notice to the representative of a sign owner that a project has been planned that may impact the sign at least 12 months prior to the filing of an eminent domain action for the sign. Provides that an owner is entitled to full and just compensation for the taking of a sign in the amount of the fair market value of the interests associated with the sign. In Marion County, allows the: (1) board of directors (board) of an agricultural fair society, association, or corporation; or (2) the county legislative body; that owns or operates a county fairgrounds to place one digital billboard at a location on the county fairgrounds selected by the board.
Title
Outdoor advertising signs.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Cherry [R] | Rep. Jim Pressel [R] | Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D] | Rep. Robert Morris [R] |
Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Public Law 97 |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-02 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 329: yeas 66, nays 24 |
2022-03-02 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 303: yeas 37, nays 11 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Freeman) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Crider) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-25 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Crider and Boots |
2022-01-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 82: yeas 85, nays 4 |
2022-01-24 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-20 | House | Representative Morris added as coauthor |
2022-01-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-13 | House | Representatives Pressel and Austin added as coauthors |
2022-01-13 | House | Representative Austin removed as coauthor |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development |
2022-01-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative Austin |
2022-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Cherry |