IN HB1260 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Public Law 81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Public Law 81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Issuance of hospital license. Requires, beginning January 1, 2019, the state department of health (state department) to issue a hospital license to a hospital that has received accreditation by recognized accrediting organizations for the period the recognized accrediting organization has been granted accreditation. Allows the state department to investigate complaints against an accredited hospital for substantial noncompliance with accredited standards when requested by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services. Requires the state department to conduct annual surveys for hospitals that are not accredited by a recognized accrediting organization. Requires the state department to conduct random validation surveys on behalf
Title
Issuance of hospital license. Requires, beginning January 1, 2019, the state department of health (state department) to issue a hospital license to a hospital that has received accreditation by recognized accrediting organizations for the period the recognized accrediting organization has been granted accreditation. Allows the state department to investigate complaints against an accredited hospital for substantial noncompliance with accredited standards when requested by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services. Requires the state department to conduct annual surveys for hospitals that are not accredited by a recognized accrediting organization. Requires the state department to conduct random validation surveys on behalf
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R] | Rep. Doug Gutwein [R] | Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Public Law 81 |
2018-03-14 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 334: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2018-03-05 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 255: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-02-01 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Crider |
2018-02-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 133: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2018-01-31 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-29 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2018-01-16 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Gutwein and GiaQuinta |
2018-01-16 | House | Authored by Representative Karickhoff |