IN HB1255 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health matters. Amends the definitions of "practitioner", for purposes of the health professions and professional standards of practice laws, to include individuals who held a license, certificate, registration, or permit when the alleged violation of the standard of practice occurred. Makes technical corrections and conforming changes to certain health related laws.
Title
Health matters.
Sponsors
Rep. Bradford Barrett [R] | Rep. Cindy Ziemke [R] | Rep. Donald Lehe [R] | Rep. Ryan Hatfield [D] |
Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Public Law 36 |
2022-03-07 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-02-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 204: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-25 | House | Representatives Ziemke, Lehe, Hatfield added as coauthors |
2022-01-25 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau |
2022-01-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 81: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2022-01-24 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-20 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2022-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Barrett |