IN HB1254 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 77
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 77
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Newborn screening requirements. Provides that beginning July 1, 2022, only a disorder recommended by a perinatal genetics and genomics advisory committee (committee) with expertise in newborn screening, and through protocols prescribed by the state department, may be added to the list of disorders requiring the examination of infants. Provides that beginning July 1, 2022, a committee with expertise in newborn screening, and through protocols established by the state department, may recommend the addition of a disorder to, or deletion of a disorder from, the required examination. Provides that the state department shall adopt rules to add disorders to, or delete disorders from, the required examination. Provides that the state department shall include any disorder added to or deleted from the required examination on a list on the state department's Internet web site. Provides that the committee shall affirm the addition of, or deletion of, any disorder to the examination requirement on an annual basis.
Title
Newborn screening requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Bradford Barrett [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Rowray [R] | Rep. Gregory Porter [D] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] |
Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] | Sen. Fady Qaddoura [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Public Law 77 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 238: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senator Qaddoura added as cosponsor |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as second sponsor |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-25 | House | Representatives Rowray E, Porter added as coauthors |
2022-01-25 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau |
2022-01-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 80: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2022-01-24 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2022-01-13 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2022-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Barrett |