IN HB1253 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the President Pro Tempore
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Transfers the umbilical cord blood donation initiative from a nonprofit corporation established by the secretary of family and social services to the state department of health and changes the name from "umbilical cord blood donation initiative" to postnatal donation initiative. Eliminates the nonprofit corporation. Eliminates the duty of the nonprofit board to establish a public umbilical cord blood bank. Establishes the postnatal donation board to assist the state department of health. Provides civil immunity to persons who participate in the postnatal donation initiative. Repeals the provisions related to the conduct of the umbilical cord blood program through the office of the secretary of family and social services and its nonprofit corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Umbilical cord blood bank.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 125303 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Roll Call 125301 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-25HouseSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-25HouseSigned by the Governor
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-13HousePublic Law 138
2014-03-12HouseJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
2014-03-12SenateJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
2014-02-25SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2014-02-25SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 246: yeas 47 and nays 0
2014-02-24SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor.
2014-02-17SenateSecond reading: engrossed.
2014-02-13SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-04SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services
2014-01-29HouseSenator Mishler added as second sponsor.
2014-01-29HouseSenator Pat Miller added as sponsor.
2014-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-01-29HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 109: yeas 94 and nays 0
2014-01-28HouseHB 1253 Amendment #1 (Zent), prevailed.
2014-01-28HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2014-01-23HouseRepresentative C. Brown added as coauthor.
2014-01-23HouseRepresentative T. Brown added as coauthor.
2014-01-23HouseRepresentative Clere added as coauthor.
2014-01-14HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Public Health
2014-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative Zent.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1253/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/9/1/9c9109a2/HB1253.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/4/8/8d48334c/HB1253.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/2/4/9824663c/HB1253.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/c/1/f9c1ef46/HB1253.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/0/3/57033b45/HB1253.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/b/2/f5b213ae/HB1253.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/a/5/c/aa5c74c2/HB1253.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/4/2/5c425a71/HB1253.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/7/1/d171f269/HB1253.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/b/2/bbb2526b/HB1253.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/2/a/ad2a35b5/HB1253.03.ENGH.109.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/9/9/e6995d78/HB1253.03.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/1/c/291c8cfb/HB1253.04.COMS.246.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback