IN HB1252 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 184
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Probate and guardianship matters. Removes conflicts between probate and guardianship statutes regarding classification of claims. Requires, for purposes of the power of attorney act, that a principal may not be a minor. Creates a tenant's representative for a deceased tenant or a tenant who is under a guardianship and specifies who may accept an appointment as a tenant's representative. Protects the proceeds from the sale of real property where no estate administration has been opened within five months of the decedent's date of death from claims of all creditors. Lists the claims having priority and preference in certain circumstances. Makes a technical correction between SEA 276 and HB 1252.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Probate and guardianship matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HousePublic Law 184
2021-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-23SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-12HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 403: yeas 89, nays 0
2021-04-08HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-03-31SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-03-30SenateSenator Koch added as second sponsor
2021-03-30SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 292: yeas 50, nays 0
2021-03-29SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-25SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-18SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-02-02HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-01HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Freeman
2021-02-01HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 26: yeas 96, nays 0
2021-01-28HouseRepresentative Hatfield added as coauthor
2021-01-28HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-26HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Torr
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Young J

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1252/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/5/c/975cd7ec/HB1252.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/4/0/6d40e4c2/HB1252.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/9/c/459c72fb/HB1252.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/5/9/db59d6af/HB1252.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/b/2/60b20813/HB1252.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/6/8/0968a2e8/HB1252.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/9/6/129649be/HB1252.04.ENRS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/8/6/1686c4d4/HB1252.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/4/d/ca4d0093/HB1252.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/f/a/14faad18/HB1252.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/3/a/6e3a85c9/HB1252.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/4/4/2e44f450/HB1252.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/6/c/526c1ec5/HB1252.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/c/d/7fcd1c13/HB1252.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/9/c/d89c7e62/HB1252.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/b/4/9bb42759/HB1252.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/7/f/bc7f99db/HB1252.03.COMS.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/5/5/3255f319/HB1252.04.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/5/d/595d65ca/HB1252.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/c/5/37c58eae/HB1252.26_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/0/c/620c0992/HB1252.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/1/c/bb1cc8ec/HB1252.292_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/e/2/01e26025/HB1252.403_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback