IN HB1248 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Public Law 96
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Public Law 96
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Direct contact with specified animals. Prohibits a person that owns or possesses a specified animal from allowing a member of the public to come into direct contact, or enter into a proximity that allows for or permits direct contact, with the specified animal. Prohibits the department of natural resources from adopting a rule to designate additional specified animals. Requires that a person who owns a specified animal must have a commercial animal dealer, breeder, or exhibitor's license issued by the United States Department of Agriculture. Provides that a violation of the law is a Class B infraction. Excludes from the substance of the bill physical contact or proximity between certain persons and a specified animal. Defines terms.
Title
Direct contact with specified animals.
Sponsors
Rep. David Abbott [R] | Rep. Chris Campbell [D] | Rep. Pat Boy [D] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] |
Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 66 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Public Law 96 |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-02-22 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 249: yeas 66, nays 26 |
2022-02-21 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 203: yeas 43, nays 4 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as second sponsor |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Doriot) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-27 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Doriot |
2022-01-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 125: yeas 68, nays 27 |
2022-01-26 | House | Amendment #1 (Abbott) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-26 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-25 | House | Representative Boy added as coauthor |
2022-01-24 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2022-01-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative Campbell |
2022-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Abbott |