IN HB1246 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - First Reading: Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - First Reading: Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a city other than Indianapolis or a town to enter into a contract for the collection and disposal of solid waste through a request for proposals process instead of a bidding process.
Title
Solid waste collection and disposal contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-28 - House - House Floor - (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Roll Call 124601 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Roll Call 124601 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Local Government |
2014-01-29 | House | Senator Broden added as second sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-28 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 93: yeas 94 and nays 0 |
2014-01-28 | House | Senator Wyss added as sponsor. |
2014-01-27 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-23 | House | Representative GiaQuinta added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | House | Representative Niemeyer added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | House | Representative Candelaria Reardon added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-14 | House | First Reading: Referred to Government and Regulatory Reform |
2014-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Carbaugh. |