IN HB1245 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the President Pro Tempore
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the President Pro Tempore
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various changes to the laws concerning: (1) financial institutions; (2) debt management companies; (3) pawnbrokers; (4) money transmitters; (5) check cashers; (6) persons licensed under the Uniform Consumer Credit Code; (7) first lien mortgage lenders; and (8) rental purchase agreements. Provides that a lessor that leases property under rental purchase agreements may, subject to certain conditions, offer for sale to members of the general public at the location where the lessor enters into rental purchase agreements: (1) property and services that were or may be the subject of a rental purchase agreement; and (2) property or services that are unrelated or only partially or indirectly related to the lessor's rental purchase agreement business. Repeals a provision that provides that all debts: (1) owed to certain financial institutions; and (2) on which interest is past due for a period of six months; are bad debts unless, in the opinion of the department of financial institutions, the debts are well secured.
Title
Various financial institutions matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Financial Institutions - Roll Call 124502 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Financial Institutions - Roll Call 124501 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Financial Institutions - Roll Call 124502 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Financial Institutions - Roll Call 124501 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-25 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Public Law 137 |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 405: yeas 86 and nays 0 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 245: yeas 47 and nays 0 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Financial Institutions |
2014-01-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 92: yeas 92 and nays 0 |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-28 | House | Senator Holdman added as sponsor. |
2014-01-27 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-14 | House | First Reading: Referred to Financial Institutions |
2014-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative Burton |
2014-01-13 | House | Representative Hale added as coauthor. |
2014-01-13 | House | Representative Moed added as coauthor. |
2014-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Heaton. |