IN HB1242 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - Representative Turner added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of correction to establish, implement, and maintain an offender behavior management program. Provides that an offender who completes a behavior management program may receive good time credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Credit time for behavior management programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-02 Representative Turner added as coauthor
2010-02-02 Third reading: call withdrawn
2010-02-01 Amendment 2 (V. Smith), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-01 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-01-28 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-19 Representatives Pryor and Foley added as coauthors
2010-01-12 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2010-01-12 Authored by Representative V. Smith

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback