IN HB1231 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Public Law 110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Public Law 110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Deer hunting. Provides that certain rifles may be used to hunt deer on privately owned land during the firearms seasons beginning after June 30, 2016, and ending before January 1, 2020. Requires the department of natural resources (DNR) to report on the impact of the use of rifles to hunt deer. Authorizes the use of a handgun that fires a commercially available bullet of 10 millimeters in diameter to hunt deer.
Title
Deer hunting. Provides that certain rifles may be used to hunt deer on privately owned land during the firearms seasons beginning after June 30, 2016, and ending before January 1, 2020. Requires the department of natural resources (DNR) to report on the impact of the use of rifles to hunt deer. Authorizes the use of a handgun that fires a commercially available bullet of 10 millimeters in diameter to hunt deer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | Public Law 110 |
2016-03-22 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 374: yeas 38, nays 12 |
2016-03-08 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 396: yeas 84, nays 5 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2016-03-07 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Messmer, Mrvan and Steele |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Tomes and Arnold J |
2016-03-03 | House | House advisors appointed: Karickhoff, Eberhart, Stemler and Errington |
2016-03-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Arnold L and Kersey |
2016-03-02 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2016-03-02 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 276: yeas 26, nays 24 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senator Steele added as cosponsor |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-02-01 | House | Representatives Errington, Lucas, Ellington J, Morrison, DeVon, McNamara, VanNatter added as coauthors |
2016-02-01 | House | Representative Bacon added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2016-02-01 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Tomes and Messmer |
2016-02-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 100: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2016-01-28 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-25 | House | Representatives Stemler, Eberhart, Aylesworth added as coauthors |
2016-01-25 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2016-01-11 | House | Authored by Representative Arnold L |