IN HB1230 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Public Law 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Public Law 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulation of coal combustion residuals. Authorizes the environmental rules board to adopt rules consistent with the regulations of the United States Environmental Protection Agency concerning standards for the disposal of coal combustion residuals in landfills and surface impoundments.
Title
Regulation of coal combustion residuals. Authorizes the environmental rules board to adopt rules consistent with the regulations of the United States Environmental Protection Agency concerning standards for the disposal of coal combustion residuals in landfills and surface impoundments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | House | Public Law 1 |
2017-02-23 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-02-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 102: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as cosponsor |
2017-01-26 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-01-24 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Bassler |
2017-01-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 20: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2017-01-17 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-01-12 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2017-01-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative Ober |
2017-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Wolkins |