IN HB1226 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various changes to the insurance law, including the law concerning: (1) derivatives transactions; (2) life insurance company filing requirements; (3) insurance producer education; (4) insurer response to department of insurance requests; (5) notice of individual health insurance market withdrawal; (6) confidentiality of information concerning certain insurer filings; (7) insurance holding company regulation; (8) health maintenance organization risk based capital requirements; (9) material transaction reports; (10) credit for reinsurance; (11) external review of health coverage determinations; and (12) bail and recovery agent licensing. Provides for deposit of new civil penalties in the department of insurance fund. Removes obsolete provisions. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Insurance matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-07 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 352: yeas 79, nays 0 | |
2012-02-27 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-27 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 252: yeas 48 and nays 1 | |
2012-02-23 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-21 | Senator Mrvan added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-16 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions | |
2012-01-31 | Senate sponsor: Senator Paul | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 169: yeas 91, nays 5 | |
2012-01-26 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-23 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Lehman |