IN HB1225 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 116
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public safety. Removes the requirement that school buses have black reflective tape affixed on the bumpers and sides of the bus. Provides that, in certain instances, a person who: (1) fails to yield to an emergency vehicle; and (2) causes serious bodily injury, catastrophic injury, or death to any person operating, occupying, or affiliated with the authorized emergency vehicle; commits a Level 6 felony. Provides that the offense of resisting law enforcement is a Level 6 felony if, while committing the offense of resisting law enforcement by forcibly resisting, obstructing, or interfering with a law enforcement officer, the person: (1) creates a substantial risk of bodily injury to the person or another person; and (2) has two or more prior unrelated convictions for resisting law enforcement. Provides that the offense of resisting law enforcement is a Level 6 felony if, while committing the offense of resisting law enforcement by fleeing from a law enforcement officer, the person has two or more prior unrelated convictions for resisting law enforcement. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 70 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 116
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-05HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 322: yeas 70, nays 15
2020-03-04HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 301: yeas 50, nays 0
2020-03-02SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-03-02SenateSenator Crider added as cosponsor
2020-03-02SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2020-01-30HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-29HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Messmer and Becker
2020-01-29HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 130: yeas 85, nays 10
2020-01-27HouseAmendment #2 (DeLaney) prevailed; voice vote
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-13HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2020-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative McNamara

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1225/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/0/3/ba03dca1/HB1225.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/f/2/abf25fb3/HB1225.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/c/d/88cdc807/HB1225.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/1/f/151f8b38/HB1225.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/1/6/bd1617fc/HB1225.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/7/8/cf780923/HB1225.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/7/b/e87b4e96/HB1225.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/6/c/976c04a2/HB1225.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/c/8/6bc8f3b8/HB1225.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/d/a/62da3631/HB1225.130_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/2/b/b52b58c5/HB1225.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/9/4/d6940dea/HB1225.301_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/e/7/a4e74f59/HB1225.322_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback