IN HB1225 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Sale of electronic cigarettes to minors.
Title
Sale of electronic cigarettes to minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 20 |
2013-04-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-03-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 291: yeas 31 and nays 18 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senator Becker added as second sponsor |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2013-01-29 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Glick |
2013-01-29 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-01-29 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 44: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2013-01-28 | House | Representatives Eberhart and Austin added as coauthors |
2013-01-28 | House | Amendment 1 (Lehman), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-01-28 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-01-24 | House | Representative GiaQuinta added as coauthor |
2013-01-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2013-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Lehman |