IN HB1224 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Council on impaired and dangerous driving. Removes references to the governor's council on impaired and dangerous driving. Transfers duties of the governor's council on impaired and dangerous driving to the Indiana criminal justice institute.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Council on impaired and dangerous driving.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 23
2020-03-11HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-03SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-02HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-02-25SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2020-02-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 227: yeas 48, nays 0
2020-02-20SenateSenator Merritt added as second sponsor
2020-02-20SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-18SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-02-18SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2020-01-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-23HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Crider
2020-01-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 54: yeas 91, nays 0
2020-01-21HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-16HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-13HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2020-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative McNamara

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1224/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/d/e/e/edee4aa2/HB1224.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/8/a/328a96fe/HB1224.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/5/4/9c54edfa/HB1224.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/3/a/6a3ab878/HB1224.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/7/d/a27d6ada/HB1224.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/c/5/cdc58b63/HB1224.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/e/c/32ec9983/HB1224.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/a/d/9cad37ee/HB1224.54_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/9/3/76938da5/HB1224.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/4/b/934ba485/HB1224.227_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback