IN HB1217 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 170
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 170
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Porter County election board. Establishes a board of elections and registration for Porter County. Provides that Porter County is a county that counts absentee ballots at a central location. Provides that an appointed member of a county election board or a board of elections and registration may not be a relative of any individual that has the authority to appoint a member of the board.
Title
Porter County election board. Establishes a board of elections and registration for Porter County. Provides that Porter County is a county that counts absentee ballots at a central location. Provides that an appointed member of a county election board or a board of elections and registration may not be a relative of any individual that has the authority to appoint a member of the board.
Sponsors
Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] | Rep. Micheal Aylesworth [R] | Rep. Charles Moseley [D] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] |
Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - Amendment #1 (Hamilton) failed (Y: 31 N: 63 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - Amendment #1 (Hamilton) failed (Y: 31 N: 63 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Public Law 170 |
2019-05-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 507: yeas 88, nays 0 |
2019-04-11 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 401: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as third sponsor |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senator Walker added as second sponsor |
2019-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-01-29 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau |
2019-01-29 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 63: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2019-01-28 | House | Amendment #1 (Hamilton) failed; Roll Call 42: yeas 32, nays 63 |
2019-01-28 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-16 | House | Representative Moseley added as coauthor |
2019-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment |
2019-01-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative Aylesworth |
2019-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Soliday |