IN HB1217 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the department of natural resources (DNR) and the department of environmental management (IDEM) to develop and implement a process to improve efficiency and transparency in programs for: (1) water quality certifications from IDEM under Section 401 of the federal Clean Water Act; (2) permits from IDEM for wetland activity in a state regulated wetland; and (3) permits from the director of the DNR for a structure, obstruction, deposit, or excavation in a floodway. Requires DNR and IDEM to determine how to ensure that a person proposing to perform wetland work is informed of every state permit the person needs, to change application forms and processes to ensure that a person is not required to provide the same information separately to DNR and IDEM, to determine how either DNR or IDEM may serve as the single point of contact for applicants, to create an internal process to ensure that the appropriate office within DNR or IDEM receives and timely reviews each permit application, and to ensure that the processing of each permit application is monitored.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Efficiency and transparency for DNR and IDEM permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environmental Affairs - Roll Call 121703 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Floor - (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Environmental Affairs - Roll Call 121701 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27HouseSigned by the Governor
2014-03-27SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-13HousePublic Law 214
2014-03-13SenateConference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 426: yeas 45 and nays 0
2014-03-12HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 465: yeas 96 and nays 0
2014-03-06SenateSenator Stoops added as advisor
2014-03-06SenateSenator Hershman added as advisor
2014-03-06SenateSenator Randolph added as conferee
2014-03-06SenateSenator Yoder added as conferee
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Errington added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Gutwein added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Lehe added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Wolkins added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Bauer added as conferee
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Davisson added as conferee
2014-03-05HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2014-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2014-03-04SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 313: yeas 42 and nays 6
2014-02-27SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
2014-02-27SenateHB 1217 Amendment #2 (Hershman), prevailed.
2014-02-27SenateHB 1217 Amendment #1 (Hershman), prevailed.
2014-02-27SenateHB 1217 Amendment #3 (Yoder), prevailed.
2014-02-24SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor.
2014-02-18SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-04SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Environmental Affairs
2014-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 84: yeas 92 and nays 0
2014-01-28HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-01-28HouseSenator Yoder added as sponsor.
2014-01-27HouseHB 1217 Amendment #1 (Lehe), prevailed.
2014-01-27HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2014-01-23HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-01-15HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Environmental Affairs
2014-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Lehe
2014-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative Davisson.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1217/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/4/7/7c47374b/HB1217.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/6/7/0d670d12/HB1217.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/7/4/e474807f/HB1217.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/2/d/4c2d1e54/HB1217.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/7/6/f67655ec/HB1217.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/d/6/72d62fd6/HB1217.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/3/4/b0346f0c/HB1217.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/3/d/ad3d95e9/HB1217.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/0/c/7a0cd2c5/HB1217.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/6/9/776977b5/HB1217.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/4/d/ef4d72b8/HB1217.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/d/d/b2dd73ec/HB1217.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/a/8/2aa8259a/HB1217.03.ENGH.76.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/4/9/3b493b04/HB1217.03.ENGH.84.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/a/0/25a0f24f/HB1217.03.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/2/7/512741da/HB1217.05.ENGS.313.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/7/9/1e79dedb/HB1217.05.ENGS.465.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/e/4/64e47bd6/HB1217.05.ENGS.426.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback