IN HB1216 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Public Law 147
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Public Law 147
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid reimbursement for certain detainees. Removes provisions in current law specifying that services provided to an individual while the individual is committed to a facility for mental health services are medically necessary when provided in accordance with generally accepted clinical care guidelines. Requires Medicaid reimbursement for Medicaid covered services provided to a Medicaid recipient while the individual is detained to a facility for mental health services. Sunsets this provision on June 30, 2025. Requires, on or before February 1, 2025, the office of the secretary of family and social services to report to the budget committee certain information for Medicaid claims data ranging from July 1, 2024, to December 31, 2024. Amends the requirements for an application for detention.
Title
Medicaid reimbursement for certain detainees.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Chris Jeter [R] | Rep. Charles Moseley [D] |
Sen. Tyler Johnson [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Public Law 147 |
2024-03-13 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2024-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2024-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 299: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2024-03-06 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 280: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2024-01-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-01-22 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Johnson T, Charbonneau, Brown L |
2024-01-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 22: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2024-01-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-01-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-01-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2024-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Steuerwald |
2024-01-09 | House | Coauthored by Representatives McNamara, Jeter, Moseley |