IN HB1216 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Funding for the development of health professions. Establishes the linking industry to nursing education fund (fund) for the purpose of expanding nursing education opportunities. Defines terms and provides administrative provisions for the fund. Requires the commission for higher education (commission), before August 1, 2023, to develop an application for a competitive grant program that matches contributions from a health care entity to an educational institution on a dollar for dollar basis from the fund. Provides that the application may be submitted by any educational institution and must require the educational institution to include the expected number of additional students the educational institution will be able to accept into its nursing education program as a result of the matching program. Requires the commission to approve an application if sufficient funds are available and if the matching grant will be used by the educational institution for certain purposes. Provides that a partial grant may be awarded. Requires the commission to make an annual report of certain information to the legislative council. Provides that a matching grant may not be used for the construction of a new building or the renovation of an existing building. Requires the professional licensing agency to retain 80% of all fees collected from new and renewed board licenses and certificates unless a certain amount or percentage of the fee is designated for a specific fund. Requires the agency to use the amount retained to carry out the agency's purposes and to work toward the goal of issuing all new licenses and certificates within 30 days after a complete application is submitted. Appropriates from the state general fund to the commission for higher education $30,000,000 for the state fiscal year beginning July 1, 2023, and ending June 30, 2024, and $30,000,000 for the state fiscal year beginning July 1, 2024, and ending June 30, 2025, to be used for the fund.
Title
Funding for the development of health professions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Manning |
Subjects
COMMISSIONS OR COUNCILS, Existing Agencies
HEALTH, Health Care Professionals
HIGHER EDUCATION, Colleges and Universities
LICENSES AND LICENSING
NURSES AND NURSING
PUBLIC FUNDS
HEALTH, Health Care Professionals
HIGHER EDUCATION, Colleges and Universities
LICENSES AND LICENSING
NURSES AND NURSING
PUBLIC FUNDS
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2023/bills/house/1216/details |
Text | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2023/bills/house/1216/#1.INTR |