IN HB1216 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Elimination of textbook fees. Requires each public school to provide curricular materials at no cost to each student enrolled in the public school. Establishes the curricular materials fund (fund) to provide state advancements for costs incurred by public schools in providing curricular materials to students at no cost. Provides that the department of education (department) shall administer the fund. Provides that for state fiscal years beginning after June 30, 2023, money in the fund is continually appropriated. Provides that a governing body or organizer of a charter school: (1) may purchase from a publisher any curricular materials selected by proper officials; (2) may rent curricular materials to certain nonpublic schools; and (3) may not rent the curricular materials to any student enrolled in any public school. Repeals a requirement that a school corporation must offer curricular materials at a reasonable rate to a family that moves during the school term. Repeals a requirement that a township trustee must use specified accounting methods for a curricular materials rental fund. Makes conforming changes. Requests an appropriation in the state budget to the fund for the biennium beginning July 1, 2023, and ending June 30, 2025. Appropriates from the state general fund to the office of the secretary of family and social services an amount sufficient to meet maintenance of effort requirements in the state budget for the biennium beginning July 1, 2023, and ending June 30, 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elimination of textbook fees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2022-01-06HouseAuthored by Representative Hatfield

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback