IN HB1215 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 202
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State and local matters. Permits a historic preservation or rehabilitation grant to be awarded at the time plans are approved. Requires a grant contract between the office of community and rural affairs and the person receiving the grant. Provides that the grant may be up to 35%, instead of 20%, of the qualified expenditures, but the grant may not exceed $100,000. Replaces a certification that the work substantially complies with the proposed plan with a finding that the plan complies with the program guidelines. Eliminates the deadlines for completing the work. Provides that if the grant applicant is a nonprofit

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State and local matters. Permits a historic preservation or rehabilitation grant to be awarded at the time plans are approved. Requires a grant contract between the office of community and rural affairs and the person receiving the grant. Provides that the grant may be up to 35%, instead of 20%, of the qualified expenditures, but the grant may not exceed $100,000. Replaces a certification that the work substantially complies with the proposed plan with a finding that the plan complies with the program guidelines. Eliminates the deadlines for completing the work. Provides that if the grant applicant is a nonprofit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Amendment #4 (Riecken) prevailed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24HousePublic Law 202
2016-03-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-16SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-15HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-10HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2016-03-10SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 405: yeas 47, nays 3
2016-03-10HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 437: yeas 98, nays 0
2016-03-10SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2016-02-29SenateSenate advisors appointed: Perfect, Mrvan and Raatz
2016-02-29SenateSenate conferees appointed: Crider and Randolph Lonnie M
2016-02-29HouseHouse advisors appointed: Thompson, Braun and DeLaney
2016-02-29HouseHouse conferees appointed: Cherry and Riecken
2016-02-29HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2016-02-29HouseMotion to dissent filed
2016-02-26SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2016-02-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 224: yeas 43, nays 2
2016-02-22SenateSenator Perfect added as second sponsor
2016-02-22SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2016-02-22SenateAmendment #1 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
2016-02-22SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-02-16SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-02-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2016-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2016-02-03HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Crider
2016-02-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 164: yeas 98, nays 0
2016-02-02HouseAmendment #4 (Riecken) prevailed; Roll Call 127: yeas 96, nays 0
2016-02-02HouseAmendment #2 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote
2016-02-02HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-01-28HouseRepresentative Thompson added as coauthor
2016-01-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-11HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2016-01-11HouseCoauthored by Representative Brown T
2016-01-11HouseAuthored by Representative Cherry

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/house/1215/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/3/2/2932e8f2/HB1215.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/2/c/fc2c214d/HB1215.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/8/9/2889fb82/HB1215.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/8/2/e/a82ec91d/HB1215.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/7/3/a77367f2/HB1215.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/5/c/5c5c0a5b/HB1215.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/0/0/06006e78/HB1215.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/d/b/e1db3208/HB1215.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/a/d/39ad87bf/HB1215.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/f/f/e0ff5c2f/HB1215.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/9/7/0c97d15f/HB1215.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/1/f/561fc482/HB1215.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/a/c/4dac4cf5/HB1215.127.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/1/5/a1152c77/HB1215.164.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/8/4/b384753e/HB1215.03.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/a/7/6fa7ffd8/HB1215.224.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/5/b/3c5bcd30/HB1215.405.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/e/e/69ee74a8/HB1215.437.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback