IN HB1203 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elimination of textbook fees. Requires each public school to provide curricular materials at no cost to each student enrolled in the public school. Establishes the student resource fund (fund) to provide state advancements for costs incurred by public schools in providing curricular materials to students at no cost. Provides that the department of education (department) shall administer the fund. Provides that for state fiscal years beginning after June 30, 2023, money in the fund is continually appropriated. Provides that a governing body or organizer of a charter school: (1) may purchase from a publisher any curricular materials selected by proper officials; (2) may rent curricular materials to certain nonpublic schools; and (3) may not rent the curricular materials to any student enrolled in any public school. Repeals a requirement that a school corporation must offer curricular materials at a reasonable rate to a family that moves during the school term. Repeals a requirement that a township trustee must use specified accounting methods for a curricular materials rental fund. Makes conforming changes. Requests an appropriation in the state budget to the fund for the biennium beginning July 1, 2023, and ending June 30, 2025. Appropriates from the state general fund to the office of the secretary of family and social services an amount sufficient to meet maintenance of effort requirements in the state budget for the biennium beginning July 1, 2023, and ending June 30, 2025.
Title
Elimination of textbook fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-10 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Hatfield, Bartels, Miller D |
2023-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative O'Brien |
Subjects
EDUCATION, Secretary of Education, State Department and Boards
FAMILY AND SOCIAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
PRIVATE SCHOOLS
SCHOOLS generally (K-12)
SCHOOLS, Charter Schools
SCHOOLS, Curricula
SCHOOLS, Funds and Budgets
TOWNSHIPS AND TOWNSHIP OFFICERS
FAMILY AND SOCIAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
PRIVATE SCHOOLS
SCHOOLS generally (K-12)
SCHOOLS, Charter Schools
SCHOOLS, Curricula
SCHOOLS, Funds and Budgets
TOWNSHIPS AND TOWNSHIP OFFICERS
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2023/bills/house/1203/details |
Text | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2023/bills/house/1203/#1.INTR |