IN HB1202 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Senate advisors appointed: Boots and Tallian
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Senate advisors appointed: Boots and Tallian
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sentencing. Establishes a procedure to allows certain inmates in the department of correction (department) an additional opportunity to request sentence modification from the sentencing court if the department has recommended sentence modification. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Sentencing.
Sponsors
Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Robert Morris [R] | Rep. Ryan Hatfield [D] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] |
Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 15 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 15 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Boots and Tallian |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Bohacek and Taylor G |
2021-04-14 | House | House advisors appointed: Morris, Young J and Hatcher |
2021-04-14 | House | House conferees appointed: McNamara and Hatfield |
2021-04-14 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2021-04-14 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 418: yeas 44, nays 5 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Young M) prevailed; Division of the Senate: yeas 39, nays 10 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Tallian) failed; Roll Call 405: yeas 15, nays 35 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as cosponsor |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-16 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Bohacek and Boots |
2021-02-16 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 139: yeas 89, nays 7 |
2021-02-08 | House | Representative Hatfield added as coauthor |
2021-02-08 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2021-01-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative Morris |
2021-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative McNamara |