IN HB1198 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that evidence that a person: (1) acquired a motor vehicle by lease; (2) signed a written agreement to return the motor vehicle to a specified location within a specified time; and (3) failed to return the motor vehicle within 21 days after that time or five days after a written demand; constitutes prima facie evidence that the person knowingly or intentionally exerted unauthorized control over property of another person. Requires a city, town, or county law enforcement agency to report the theft of, or failure to return, leased motor vehicles to the National Crime Information Center.
Title
Criminal conversion of leased motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-02-02 | Senate sponsors: Senators Steele and Tallian | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 133: Yeas 94, Nays 2 | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-25 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Interstate and International Cooperation | |
2010-01-11 | Coauthored by Representatives Grubb and L. Lawson | |
2010-01-11 | Authored by Representative Steuerwald |